Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Veit Truchseß von Pommersfelden

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Apr 1501SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 May 1501ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Sep 1503DiedBishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Veit Truchseß von Pommersfelden (VIAF: 70072211)
Father Veit Truchseß von Pommersfelden (died ) Bishop-Elect of Bamberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018