Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar Tobritsch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Microcomien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1444¹Born
1476²32.0Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Apr 149854.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Apr 149854.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Microcomien
7 Oct 149854.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Microcomien
2 Jun 150258.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
1511¹67.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kaspar Tobritsch (VIAF: 27501618)
Bishop Kaspar Tobritsch (born 1444, died 1511) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIngolstadt
Ordained BishopEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 191
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1498, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 22 Mar 2019

Quantcast