Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Jakob von Kuen-Belasy

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1515¹Born
154833.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
28 Nov 156045.9SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Jan 156146.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
16 Feb 156146.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 May 158671.3DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Jakob von Kuen-Belasy (VIAF: 74791269)
Archbishop Johann Jakob von Kuen-Belasy (born 1515, died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2+: CB, 13 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018