Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang von Salm

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514¹Born
11 Nov 154026.8SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
18 Feb 154127.1ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
Apr 1542³28.2Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
5 Dec 155541.9DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang von Salm (VIAF: 23276837)
Bishop Wolfgang von Salm (born 1514, died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast