Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aegidius Rehm

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1486Born
6 May 152640.3AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
Oct 152640.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
15 Sep 153549.7DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Aegidius Rehm (VIAF: 27889201)
Bishop Aegidius Rehm (born 1486, died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165
  • c3: ATh, 15 Nov 2015
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,590
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 4,365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast