Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berthold Pürstinger

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465BornSalzburg
149126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
8 May 150843.4AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
9 Jul 150843.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
6 May 152661.3ResignedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
19 Jul 154378.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Berthold Pürstinger:
Bishop Berthold Pürstinger (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiemsee

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013