Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Kaps

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gurk

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1435¹Born
14 Mar 149156.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
14 Mar 149156.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
4 Apr 149156.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
28 Sep 149964.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gurk, Austria
Apr 1512³77.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Kaps:
Bishop Nikolaus Kaps Auxiliary Bishop of Gurk

  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,935
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013