Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sigmund von Hollenegg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Oct 1494SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Dec 1494ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
8 Feb 1495Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
3 Jul 1495DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Sigmund von Hollenegg:
Archbishop Sigmund von Hollenegg (died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,427
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013