Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernhard von Rohr

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg

Apostolic Administrator of Wien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1418¹BornKremsmünster
25 Feb 146648.1SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
21 Apr 146648.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
8 Jun 1466³48.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 Dec 148466.9ResignedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
20 Dec 148466.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wien, Austria
21 Mar 148769.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernhard von Rohr (VIAF: 18294352)
Archbishop Bernhard von Rohr (born 1418, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 228
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,953

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Sep 2016