Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich Sonnenberger (Hinnenberger)

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1453AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
20 Jan 1454Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
29 Dec 1469DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ulrich Sonnenberger (Hinnenberger):
Bishop Ulrich Sonnenberger (Hinnenberger) (died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 162
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,600

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013