Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent von Freiberg

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1474AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
4 Oct 1478Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
15 Aug 1487DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Laurent von Freiberg:
Bishop Laurent von Freiberg (died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a bishop for 8.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 162
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013