Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Scheit (Scheidt)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Seckau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1440¹BornUlm
30 Dec 148142.0AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
31 Dec 148142.0Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
29 Jul 150262.6ResignedBishop of Seckau, Austria
14 Feb 1512³72.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Seckau, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthias Scheit (Scheidt):
Bishop Matthias Scheit (Scheidt) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Seckau

  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 295
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013