Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Kluspeck, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1531AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
18 Dec 1531AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
25 Aug 1532Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
18 Feb 1545DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Kluspeck (VIAF: 20758443)
Bishop Johann Kluspeck O. Cist. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSalzburg

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Sep 2017