Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Haidlauf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Titular Bishop of Dariensis

Titular See: (prie/Konstanz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1539Born
6 Jun 156930.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
6 Jun 156930.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dariensis
7 May 157031.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dariensis
1580²40.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Haidlauf (VIAF: 77130869)
Bishop Sebastian Haidlauf (born , died 1580) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeßkirch
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast