Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Kripper

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)

Titular See: (prie/salz)


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Nov 1570AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
8 Nov 1570AppointedTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
19 Aug 1571Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
12 Nov 1573DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christian Kripper (VIAF: 35270315)
Bishop Christian Kripper (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoberg
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau

  • a bishop for 2.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 307
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018