Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Schlattl

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1558²AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
24 Aug 1558Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 1558Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
6 Jul 1589DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph Schlattl (VIAF: 107769611)
Bishop Christoph Schlattl (died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruck
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165
  • b/c2: ATh, 3 Jun 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,871
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast