Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Stobäus von Palmburg

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532¹Born
19 Oct 158452.7AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
5 May 158553.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
23 Oct 161886.8DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Stobäus von Palmburg (VIAF: 2813498)
Bishop Georg Stobäus von Palmburg (born 1532, died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Jean, Chapel, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 21 Nov 2017