Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthasar Fannemann (Waneman)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Titular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1540AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
26 Aug 1540AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
26 Aug 1540AppointedTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
23 Sep 1551AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
8 Oct 1561DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Fannemann (Waneman):
Bishop Balthasar Fannemann (Waneman) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013