Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wolf Dietrich von Raitenau

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1559Born
2 Mar 158727.9SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
25 May 158728.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Oct 158728.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 158728.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
7 Mar 161252.9ResignedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
16 Jan 161757.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Wolf Dietrich von Raitenau (VIAF: 74645591)
Archbishop Wolf Dietrich von Raitenau (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLochau
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018