Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Cattaneo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
16 Aug 158944.6AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
3 Sep 158944.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
28 Apr 160964.3DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Cattaneo (VIAF: 28170045)
Bishop Sebastian Cattaneo O.P. (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast