Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Correrio Cammerota (Malatesta), O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Muro Lucano, Italy

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1595AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
20 Nov 1595AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
3 Dec 1595Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
1605¹ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
24 Jan 1630DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Muro Lucano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Correrio Cammerota (Malatesta)
Bishop Vincent Correrio Cammerota (Malatesta) O.P. (died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Muro Lucano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114, and Page 249
  • b: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 34, Number 172
  • d: Google Books, 2012, 9, 3
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018