Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Gaudenzio Cardinal Madruzzo

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562²Born
23 Oct 159533.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
23 Oct 159533.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Smyrna
11 Feb 159634.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Smyrna
2 Apr 160038.2SucceededBishop of Trento, Italy
9 Jun 160442.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jun 160543.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
1616²54.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
2 Mar 162664.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
16 Sep 162664.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
14 Aug 162967.6DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Gaudenzio Madruzzo (VIAF: 44406681)
Carlo Gaudenzio Cardinal Madruzzo (born 1562, died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIssogne Castle, Valle d’Aosta, Diocese of Aosta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Family Chapel, S. Onofrio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 33.5 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast