Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Emanuele von Madruzzo

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1599BornIssogne
2 Jul 162222.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
24 Aug 162222.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Trento, Italy
24 Aug 162222.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
28 Oct 162727.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 162727.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
14 Aug 162929.7SucceededBishop of Trento, Italy
21 May 163030.5InstalledBishop of Trento, Italy
15 Dec 165859.1DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Emanuele von Madruzzo:
Bishop Carlo Emanuele von Madruzzo (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102, and Page 344
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015