Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Crosini von Bonporto

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1581BornTrento
4 Jun 160524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 Aug 162443.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 Aug 162443.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
24 Feb 162543.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
16 Jul 164766.3SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
30 Mar 164867.0ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
14 Mar 166381.9DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anton Crosini von Bonporto:
Bishop Anton Crosini von Bonporto (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112, and Page 121
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015