Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Platzgummer

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹BornCastribelli
23 Apr 159530.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 164176.4SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
16 Dec 164176.9ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
24 Feb 164277.1Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 May 164782.3DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Platzgummer:
Bishop Johann Platzgummer (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015