Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Welsberg

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹Born
28 May 162945.4AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
28 Oct 162945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Mar 164157.2DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Welsberg:
Bishop Wilhelm von Welsberg (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 3 Mar 2015