Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Zeno

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 May 1627Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 1627AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
3 Oct 1627Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
24 Sep 1628DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Daniel Zeno
Bishop Daniel Zeno (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTassari
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brixen, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 1.3 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Jun 2020

Quantcast