Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Sarego

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹BornVerona
17 Sep 161254.7AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
14 Oct 161254.7Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
15 Sep 161355.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
15 Apr 162163.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
24 Sep 162264.7ResignedBishop of Adria, Italy
5 Aug 162567.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Adria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Sarego (VIAF: 315973537)
Bishop Ludovico Sarego (born 1558, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Adria

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 53, Number 298
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 25
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016