Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulgenzio Gallucci, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹Born Montegiorgio
23 May 162353.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
5 Jun 162353.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
11 Mar 162454.1AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
9 Nov 163262.8DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fulgenzio Gallucci:
Bishop Fulgenzio Gallucci O.S.A. (born 1570, died ) Bishop of Boiano

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 117, and Page 326
  • bp/bd/ap: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015