Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Bucchi (Buschio)

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1584³BornCattaro
2 Mar 160824.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 162238.8AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
11 Dec 162238.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
1655¹70.9DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bucchi (Buschio):
Bishop Vincenzo Bucchi (Buschio) (born , died 1655) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 78, Number 460
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015