Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriele Cardinal Paleotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1522Born
12 Mar 156542.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156542.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
7 Sep 156542.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
30 Jan 156643.3AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
30 Jan 156643.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
9 Feb 156643.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 156643.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bologna, Italy
4 Jul 157249.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
10 Dec 158260.1AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
11 May 158764.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
8 Nov 158967.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
20 Mar 159168.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
23 Jul 159774.8DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Paleotti (VIAF: 56668522)
Gabriele Cardinal Paleotti (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained PriestSaint Mary Major, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSaint Mary Major, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Pietro, Cathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
  • a cardinal for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 8, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 137
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1566, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Nov 2017