Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Peruzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1572AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
5 Nov 1572AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
28 Dec 1572Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
3 Apr 1581AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
1600¹DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Peruzzi (VIAF: 64183643)
Bishop Angelo Peruzzi (died 1600) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Cathedral, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,374
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,095
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293, and Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018