Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guido Luca Cardinal Ferrero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vercelli

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1537BornTorino
2 Mar 156224.7AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
19 Aug 156225.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
10 Jun 156427.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
12 Mar 156527.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Oct 156528.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
8 Feb 156628.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eufemia
6 Mar 156628.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
17 Oct 157235.4ResignedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
16 May 158547.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Guido Luca Ferrero (VIAF: 90094723)
Guido Luca Cardinal Ferrero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vercelli

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
  • a cardinal for 20.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob: CB, 8 Sep 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,231
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016