Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Salomone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sora


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1591AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
11 Aug 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
1608²ResignedBishop of Sora, Italy
12 Oct 1615DiedBishop Emeritus of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Salomone
Bishop Marco Antonio Salomone (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sora

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 302
  • ob/c2: AT, 31 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,966

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Sep 2016