Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Paleotti

Deceased

Bishop of Imola


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1611AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
2 Jul 1611Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
15 Oct 1611InstalledBishop of Imola, Italy
24 May 1619DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Paleotti:
Bishop Rodolfo Paleotti (died ) Bishop of Imola

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 50, Number 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015