Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Garzia Cardinal Mellini (Millini)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562²BornFirenze
1 Jun 160543.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
12 Jun 160543.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
20 Jun 160543.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
11 Sep 160644.7Elevated to Cardinal
7 Feb 160745.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Imola, Italy
22 May 160745.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
7 Jan 160846.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
Jun 1611³49.4ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
162260.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
14 Apr 162765.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
20 Aug 162967.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
2 Oct 162967.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Garzia Mellini (Millini):
Giovanni Garzia Cardinal Mellini (Millini) (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
  • a cardinal for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 10, and Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 296
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,929

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014