Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Antonio Santoro

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornCasertae
29 Jan 162444.0AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
4 Feb 162444.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
28 Sep 163858.7DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Antonio Santoro:
Archbishop Giulio Antonio Santoro (died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 171
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 83, Number 491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015