Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Alessandro di Sangro

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1604AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
8 Aug 1604Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 1604Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
2 May 1616AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
2 Apr 1621AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
23 Jun 1622ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
18 Feb 1633DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro di Sangro
Patriarch Alessandro di Sangro (died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76, and Page 113
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 42, Number 221
  • b/c1+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 25
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016