Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Ruiz Valdivieso

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1575BornMadrid, Spain
31 Aug 160934.2AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
4 Oct 160934.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
2 Oct 161742.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orense, Spain
Jun 1621³45.9DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ruiz Valdivieso:
Archbishop Pedro Ruiz Valdivieso (born ) Bishop of Orense

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 239, and Page 103
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 47, Number 259
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 125, Number 798

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 6 Jan 2014