Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco González Zárate (de Gamarra)

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558²BornGamarra
17 Aug 161557.6AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en Espańa)
1616²58.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en Espańa)
30 May 161658.4AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
13 Dec 162668.9DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco González Zárate (de Gamarra):
Bishop Francisco González Zárate (de Gamarra) (died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,828
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 136
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 134, Number 858

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014