Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottavio Cardinal Paravicini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1552BornRoma
5 Mar 158431.6AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
15 Jul 158432.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
Aug 1587³35.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
6 Mar 159138.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jun 159138.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
20 Nov 159139.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
9 Mar 159239.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
10 May 159643.8ResignedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
3 Feb 161158.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Paravicini (VIAF: 23022769)
Ottavio Cardinal Paravicini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1591
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 103
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016