Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Archinto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1549BornMilano
Jun 1591²41.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 159545.5AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
27 Aug 159545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
7 Jun 162171.4ResignedBishop of Como, Italy
25 Nov 163282.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Filippo Archinto (VIAF: 200172607)
Bishop Filippo Archinto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Como

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 157
  • b/c2: AT, 4 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Nov 2016