Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Owen (Audoenus) Lewis (Ludovisi)

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1533Born
3 Feb 158854.1AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
14 Feb 158854.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
20 Jun 159157.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
14 Oct 159561.8DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Owen (Audoenus) Lewis (Ludovisi)
Bishop Owen (Audoenus) Lewis (Ludovisi) (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLlanfeirian, Anglesey, Great Britain

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 156
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 28, Number 130
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017