Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Bastoni

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia

Apostolic Nuncio to Naples


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1544BornMilano
30 Apr 159348.4AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
6 May 159348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
26 May 160661.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Jan 1609³64.0DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Bastoni
Bishop Guglielmo Bastoni (born , died Jan 1609) Bishop of Pavia

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 32, Number 155
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Sep 2016