Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Petrucci

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1602AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
5 May 1602Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
23 Mar 1615AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
7 Jun 1628DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Petrucci:
Archbishop Alessandro Petrucci (died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 234
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 38, Number 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013