Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michele (Bosco) Cardinal Bonelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1541Born
1559²17.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Mar 156624.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 156624.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
8 Nov 158947.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
20 Mar 159149.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
2 Apr 159149.3Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
28 Mar 159856.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele (Bosco) Bonelli (VIAF: 62720300)
Michele (Bosco) Cardinal Bonelli O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBosco Marengo, Italy
Ordained BishopMoniales S. Dominique Magnapoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
  • a cardinal for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1566
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 43
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018