Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro de Franceschi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Forli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
4 May 159449.3AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
8 May 159449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
1599¹54.0ResignedBishop of Forli, Italy
10 Jan 160156.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro de Franceschi
Bishop Alessandro de Franceschi O.P. (born 1545, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Forli

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 33, Number 162
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018