Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorino Mansi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1599AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
7 Feb 1599Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
31 Jul 1600AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ariano, Italy
20 Dec 1602SucceededBishop of Ariano, Italy
3 Apr 1611³DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittorino Mansi:
Bishop Vittorino Mansi O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Ariano

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 94, and Page 140
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 35, Number 176
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013