Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Sanvitale

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1591AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
5 May 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Spoleto, Italy
11 May 1600DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Sanvitale
Bishop Paolo Sanvitale (died ) Bishop of Spoleto

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLorette, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 29, Number 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018