Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Casali

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1529Born
1 Jul 158556.4AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
7 Jul 1585³56.4Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
1587¹57.9ResignedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
20 May 159162.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Casali (VIAF: 89640472)
Bishop Vincenzo Casali (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 237
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast